Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Litta

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1756BornMilano, Italy
6 Jun 178933.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 179337.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
6 Oct 179337.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
8 Feb 179437.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1796²39.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
11 Feb 179740.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
May 1799³43.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
23 Feb 180145.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Sep 180145.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Dec 180145.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
27 Aug 180347.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
20 May 181458.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
26 Sep 181458.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
Jun 1816³60.2ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
1818²61.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops
24 Sep 181862.5ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
1 May 182064.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Litta (VIAF: 2460110)
Lorenzo Cardinal Litta (born , died ) Prefect of Residence of Bishops

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 13
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Nov 2016