Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Basilici

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1769BornCanemorto
7 Apr 179223.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 181445.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sabina, Italy
19 Dec 181445.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
27 Dec 181445.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
25 May 181849.1AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
5 Sep 184071.4DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Basilici:
Bishop Anselmo Basilici (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 247, and Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013