Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Marchetti

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1753BornEmpoli, Italy
20 Dec 177724.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 181461.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
2 Oct 181461.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
15 Nov 182976.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Marchetti:
Archbishop Giovanni Marchetti (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ancyra

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013