Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Connolly, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of New York, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1751¹BornMonknewtown, Ireland
24 Sep 177423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Oct 181463.8AppointedBishop of New York, New York, USA
6 Nov 181463.8Ordained BishopBishop of New York, New York, USA
6 Feb 182574.1DiedBishop of New York, New York, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Connolly:
Bishop John Connolly O.P. (died ) Bishop of New York

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013