Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrose Maréchal, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1768Born
25 Mar 179223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
26 Jan 181647.1AppointedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
4 Jul 181748.5AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
14 Dec 181749.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
22 Feb 182253.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
182556.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
29 Jan 182859.1DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Maréchal (VIAF: 8950280)
Archbishop Ambrose Maréchal P.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIngré, France

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 40
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 104, and Page 305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 323, and Page 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017