Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Joseph Fenwick, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1782Born
8 Oct 180624.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
11 Jun 180825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 May 182542.6AppointedBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
1 Nov 182543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
3 Dec 182543.2InstalledBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
11 Aug 184663.9DiedBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary
Benedict Joseph Fenwick
Bishop Benedict Joseph Fenwick S.J.
(born , died )
Bishop of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonard Town, MD
Ordained PriestHoly Trinity, Church, Georgetown
Death PlaceBoston, Diocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Buried Place (Original)College of the Holy Cross, Cemetery, Worcester, Diocese of Boston, Massachusetts

Relatives
  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025