Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Byrne

Deceased

Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1802³BornNavan, Ireland
11 Nov 182724.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 184340.9AppointedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
10 Mar 184441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
10 Jun 186259.5DiedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Byrne (VIAF: 315945241)
Bishop Andrew Byrne (born , died ) Bishop of Little Rock

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016