Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Hughes

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1797BornAnnaloghan, Ireland
15 Oct 182629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Aug 183740.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of New York, New York, USA
8 Aug 183740.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
7 Jan 183840.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
20 Dec 184245.5SucceededBishop of New York, New York, USA
19 Jul 185053.1AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
3 Jan 186466.5DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Hughes:
Archbishop John Joseph Hughes (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 106, and Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013