Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Paul Lefevère (Lefebre)

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Detroit, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1804BornRoulers, Belgium
30 Nov 183127.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 184137.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Jul 184137.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
21 Nov 184137.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
4 Mar 186964.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Paul Lefevère (Lefebre):
Bishop Peter Paul Lefevère (Lefebre) (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Detroit

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 402, and Page 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013