Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ireneus Frederic Baraga

Deceased

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1797BornMala Vas, Austria
21 Sep 182326.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 185356.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Michigan, USA
29 Jul 185356.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
1 Nov 185356.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
9 Jan 185759.5AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Michigan, USA
23 Oct 186568.3AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
19 Jan 186870.6DiedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Ireneus Frederic Baraga:
Bishop Ireneus Frederic Baraga (born , died ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 97, and Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013