Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Vertin

Deceased

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1844Born
31 Aug 186622.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
16 May 187934.8AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
14 Sep 187935.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
26 Feb 189954.6DiedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for John Vertin
Bishop John Vertin (born , died ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDoblice Parice, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
Ordained PriestMarquette, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Church, Negaunee, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017