Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Trobec

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1838BornBillichgratz, Austria
8 Sep 186527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
5 Jul 189759.0AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
21 Sep 189759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
15 Apr 191475.8RetiredBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
28 May 191475.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
15 Dec 192183.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for James Trobec:
Bishop James Trobec (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013