Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Guillaume-Valentin Dubourg, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1766BornCap Français, Dominican Republic
20 Mar 179024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
18 Aug 181246.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
18 Sep 181549.7AppointedBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
24 Sep 181549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
6 Jan 181852.0InstalledBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
19 Aug 182559.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mississippi, USA
14 Jan 182660.0ResignedBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
20 Aug 182660.6SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
2 Oct 182660.7ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
4 Mar 183367.2SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
29 Jul 183367.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
12 Dec 183367.9DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Guillaume-Valentin Dubourg:
Archbishop Louis-Guillaume-Valentin Dubourg P.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 112, and Page 269
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013