Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Garnier

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1765³Born
178822.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 182661.0SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
2 Oct 182661.1ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
12 Nov 182661.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
8 May 182761.7DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Garnier (VIAF: 90713780)
Bishop Simon Garnier (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Vallier-Sur-Marne

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018