Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-François-Gabriel-Raymond-Ignace-Ferdinand de Bausset-Roquefort

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1757BornBéziers
1781¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 180850.0SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
16 Mar 180850.2ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
29 May 180850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
9 Sep 181759.6SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
1 Oct 181759.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
13 Nov 181961.8InstalledArchbishop of Aix, France
29 Jan 182971.0DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-François-Gabriel-Raymond-Ignace-Ferdinand de Bausset-Roquefort:
Archbishop Pierre-François-Gabriel-Raymond-Ignace-Ferdinand de Bausset-Roquefort (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 83, and Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015