Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Colonna d’Istria

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1758Born
18 Dec 178426.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 180243.6SelectedBishop of Nice, France
24 May 180243.7ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
11 Jul 180243.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
29 Sep 183375.0RetiredBishop of Nice, France
1 May 183576.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Colonna d’Istria
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Colonna d’Istria (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetreto-Bicchisano

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018