Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilarion-François de Chevigné de Boischollet

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1746Born
9 Apr 180255.8SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
11 May 180255.9ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
16 May 180255.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
23 Feb 181265.7DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Hilarion-François de Chevigné de Boischollet
Bishop Hilarion-François de Chevigné de Boischollet (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHerbergement

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast