Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Archidioecesis Rhedonensis (-Dolensis-Sancti Maclovii)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pierre d’Ornellas, Archbishop
  • Nicolas Jean-Marie Souchu, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 13 February 1880
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,775 (2,616 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-rennes.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Maison diocesaine, 45 rue de Brest, 35042 Rennes CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 2.99.14.35.35
  • Fax: 2.99.33.99.93

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Rennes
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Rennes (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Dol (suppressed) Diocese of Rennes
Diocese of Saint-Brieuc
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Malo (suppressed) Diocese of Rennes
Diocese of Saint-Brieuc
Diocese of Vannes
Archdiocese of Rennes
3 January 1859ElevatedDiocese of Rennes Archdiocese of Rennes
Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
13 February 1880UnitedArchdiocese of Rennes Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
1950555,000578,30096.0%1,1601501,3104233003,600390ap1951
1970640,000660,00097.0%9811101,0915863593,500401ap1971
1980677,600711,00095.3%790828727772912,500404ap1981
1990700,000749,76493.4%563856481,08081782,261402ap1991
1999784,000865,00090.6%505225271,487151201,517402ap2000
2000785,000867,53390.5%506755811,35117971,549402ap2001
2001785,000867,53390.5%500955951,31918951,445402ap2002
2002785,000881,00089.1%468325001,57020931,405402ap2003
2003786,000894,00087.9%505325371,463211231,32684ap2004
2004794,264903,40087.9%496285241,515261161,30584ap2005
2010824,000945,00087.2%340904301,916351401,19082ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 19 Feb 2014