Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Louis-René Des Nos

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1717BornErnée
13 Jul 176144.5AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
16 Aug 176144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
25 Dec 176953.0SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
25 Jan 177053.0ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
12 Mar 177053.2ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
2 Sep 179376.7DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Louis-René Des Nos:
Bishop Henri-Louis-René Des Nos (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a bishop for 32.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013