Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Luçon

Dioecesis Lucionensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alain Castet, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 7,016 (2,709 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-vendee.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Évêché, 30 Place General-Leclerc, B.P. 219, 85402 Lucon CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 2.51.28.53.00
  • Fax: 2.51.28.53.27

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Luçon
16 August 1317ErectedDiocese of Poitiers Diocese of Luçon (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Luçon (suppressed) Diocese of La Rochelle
Diocese of Luçon
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of La Rochelle Diocese of Luçon
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Luçon (from Bordeaux)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Luçon
1950392,000400,00098.0%611125736532165950304ap1951
1970400,000421,25095.0%6171938104934252,408305ap1971
1980411,400455,60090.3%594706646192282,121307ap1981
1990470,000510,00092.2%4946656083941951,643307ap1991
1999480,000509,30094.2%41965484991241591,37759ap2000
2000505,000539,00093.7%409594681,079261511,33059ap2001
2001500,000539,66492.7%409894981,004251621,28659ap2002
2002505,000539,66493.6%393904831,045271621,27959ap2003
2003505,000539,66493.6%388874751,063281541,22159ap2004
2004505,000539,66493.6%377584351,160301231,18159ap2005
2013522,800614,00085.1%241883291,5894214088659ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.6, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015