Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Massé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

Titular Bishop of Phaena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1877BornArdelay
11 Apr 190325.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 193860.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luçon, France
27 Jul 193860.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Phaena
9 Nov 193861.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phaena
30 Jan 194062.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Luçon, France
8 May 196991.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles Massé:
Bishop Charles Massé (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013