Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Eugène Bretault, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Koudougou, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1904Born
29 Jun 192924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
24 Oct 194743.2AppointedPrefect of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
27 Jun 195449.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
27 Jun 195449.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufetula
28 Oct 195450.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufetula
14 Sep 195551.1AppointedBishop of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
19 Nov 196561.2ResignedBishop of Koudougou, Burkina Faso
19 Nov 196561.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
28 Jul 197671.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
13 Oct 198581.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Koudougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Eugène Bretault
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Eugène Bretault M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Koudougou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, France

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017