Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Alexander VII

Fabio Chigi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1599BornSiena
Dec 1634³35.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 163535.9AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
1 Jul 163536.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
11 Jun 163940.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
165151.8AppointedSecretary of State
Feb 165252.9ResignedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
19 Feb 165253.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 165253.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
13 May 165354.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
7 Jan 165555.9ResignedSecretary of State
7 Apr 165556.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Apr 165556.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 May 166768.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Chigi:
Pope Fabio Chigi (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014