Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calanio della Ciaja

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1647Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 1652AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
7 Jul 1652Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
Dec 1654DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Calanio della Ciaja
Bishop Calanio della Ciaja (died Dec 1654) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienna

  • a priest for 7.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1652, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018