Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Urban VIII

Maffeo Barberini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1568BornFlorence
20 Oct 160436.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
28 Oct 160436.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
4 Dec 160436.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
160637.7AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Sep 160638.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 160739.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
27 Oct 160840.5AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
8 Jan 161041.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
5 May 161042.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
17 Jul 161749.2ResignedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
162354.7ResignedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
6 Aug 162355.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Sep 162355.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Jul 164476.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Maffeo Barberini:
Pope Maffeo Barberini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 39.7 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 321, and Page 254
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 42, Number 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014