Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Florence Conry, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
30 Mar 160940.2AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
3 May 160940.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
16 Nov 162960.8DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Florence Conry:
Archbishop Florence Conry O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 348
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 46, Number 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015