Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Sorbolonghi

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1600AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
23 Apr 1600Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
13 Apr 1616DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Sorbolonghi:
Bishop Andrea Sorbolonghi (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 183
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 36, Number 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013