Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Richardot

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573²BornArras
30 Apr 160330.3AppointedBishop of Arras, France
8 Jun 160330.4Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
17 Aug 160936.6AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
161037.0InstalledArchbishop of Cambrai, France
28 Feb 161441.1DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Richardot:
Archbishop Jean Richardot (died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 99, and Page 131
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 40, Number 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015