Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simeone Cardinal Tagliavia d’Aragonia

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1550BornCastle Veziano, Italy
12 Dec 158333.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 158535.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria degli Angeli
9 Dec 159242.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
18 Aug 159747.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
21 Feb 160049.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
30 Aug 160050.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
17 Jun 160252.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
21 Jul 160252.1Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
19 Feb 160352.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
20 May 160454.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Simeone Tagliavia d’Aragonia:
Simeone Cardinal Tagliavia d’Aragonia (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
  • a cardinal for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015