Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Paul V

Camillo Borghese

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1552BornRome
5 Jun 159643.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159643.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
14 Apr 159744.6AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
27 May 159744.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
10 Mar 159946.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
2 Aug 159946.9ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
22 Apr 160249.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
16 May 160552.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 May 160552.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 Jan 162168.4DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Camillo Borghese:
Holy Father Camillo Borghese (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013