Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Taddeo Sarti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹BornBologne
31 May 160464.4AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
7 Jun 160464.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
161676.0ResignedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
24 Nov 161777.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Taddeo Sarti:
Bishop Taddeo Sarti (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nepi e Sutri

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 257
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 41, Number 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015