Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni (Giannettino) Cardinal Doria

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1573BornGenoa
9 Jun 160431.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Dec 160532.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
4 Feb 160834.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Palermo, Italy
4 Feb 160834.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
4 May 160835.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
5 Jul 160835.3SucceededArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
2 Oct 162350.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
19 Nov 164269.7DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (Giannettino) Doria:
Cardinal Giovanni (Giannettino) Doria (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
  • a cardinal for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 335
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,881

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013