Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Vendramin

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1555Born
26 Jul 160549.7SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
1 Mar 1608³52.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 160852.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
26 May 160852.6Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
2 Dec 161560.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 161661.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
7 Oct 161963.9DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vendramin (VIAF: 67357547)
Francesco Cardinal Vendramin (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained PriestVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopPope's Private Chapel, Vatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria del Carmine Chapel, San Marco, Cathedral, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 11.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 8
  • op/c1: AT, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017