Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Berlinghiero Cardinal Gessi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1563BornBologna
13 Nov 160643.0AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
19 Nov 160643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
4 Jun 160743.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
14 Nov 161855.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
20 Nov 161956.0ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
19 Jan 162662.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jul 162763.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
6 Apr 163975.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Berlinghiero Gessi (VIAF: 96875734)
Berlinghiero Cardinal Gessi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 43, Number 229
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 21
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016