Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonmaria Cardinal Sauli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹BornGenoa
9 Nov 157229.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
15 Oct 157734.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
27 Nov 158542.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Genova, Italy
27 Nov 158542.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
24 Feb 158643.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
Dec 1586²43.9SucceededArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Dec 158744.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158845.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
14 Jan 159148.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
9 Aug 159148.6ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
19 Feb 160360.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
7 Feb 160764.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
17 Aug 161168.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
16 Sep 161572.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
6 Apr 162077.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
24 Aug 162380.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonmaria Sauli (VIAF: 66458300)
Antonmaria Cardinal Sauli (born 1543, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 37.5 years
  • a cardinal for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 215, and Page 273
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016