Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Graziani

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
17 Feb 159255.1AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
25 Feb 159255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
23 Feb 159659.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
8 Oct 159861.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1 Apr 161174.2DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Graziani (VIAF: 27065444)
Bishop Antonio Maria Graziani (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast