Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Pierbenedetti

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1592AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
12 Mar 1592Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
4 Jun 1604DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Pierbenedetti
Bishop Roberto Pierbenedetti (died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast