Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianfrancesco Cardinal Morosini

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1537Born
23 Sep 158547.9AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
1587²49.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
15 Jul 158850.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jul 158850.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
1589²51.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
28 Mar 159052.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
10 Jan 159658.2DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Morosini (VIAF: 187655347)
Gianfrancesco Cardinal Morosini (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained PriestVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Buried Place (Original)Next to Altar of S. Croce, Cathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia

  • a cardinal for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Jul 1588
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018