Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fantino Petrignani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539¹Born
6 Jan 157738.0AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
5 Jan 158041.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
9 Feb 158243.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1585¹46.0ResignedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
1605¹66.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fantino Petrignani (VIAF: 315523763)
Archbishop Fantino Petrignani (born 1539, died 1605) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmelia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 280
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018