Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Bernardo de Quirós, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
15 Feb 1601AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
18 Aug 1604AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
1617²DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Bernardo de Quirós
Bishop Jerónimo Bernardo de Quirós O. Praem. (died 1617) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1601
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 140, and Page 289
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 37, Number 187
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 116, Number 733
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018