Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Metello Cardinal Bichi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541²BornSiena
15 Jan 159655.0AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
18 Feb 159655.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
12 Jun 160665.4ResignedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
17 Aug 161170.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 161170.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
17 Dec 161271.9AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
23 Mar 161574.2ResignedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
14 Jun 161978.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Metello Bichi:
Metello Cardinal Bichi (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 323
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015