Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni dei Gualtieri

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
2 Dec 161550.9AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
6 Dec 161550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
20 May 161954.3DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni dei Gualtieri:
Bishop Giovanni dei Gualtieri (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 58, Number 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015