Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Cornaro (Corner)

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹Born
12 Dec 159437.9AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
21 Dec 159437.9Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
11 Jun 162568.4DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Cornaro (Corner) (VIAF: 88641961)
Bishop Marco Cornaro (Corner) (born 1557, died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopS.Silvestre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 275
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018