Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Emo

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1565BornVenice
18 Apr 161145.9AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
24 May 161146.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
16 Oct 1622³57.4DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Emo:
Bishop Giovanni Emo (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 50, Number 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015