Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp von der Pfalz (von Bayern)

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany

Bishop of Naumburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1480Born
21 Feb 149716.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 149818.4AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
17 Oct 150727.2Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
17 Sep 151232.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Naumburg, Germany
26 Sep 151737.2SucceededBishop of Naumburg, Germany
5 Jan 154160.5DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp von der Pfalz (von Bayern)
Bishop Philipp von der Pfalz (von Bayern) (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Freising, Diocese of Freising

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198, and Page 261
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 May 2018

Quantcast