Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruprecht Pfalzgraf Simmer von Bayern de Rhein

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1461Born
3 Jul 148725.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
27 Aug 148725.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 Jul 149230.7SucceededBishop of Regensburg, Germany
25 Nov 149231.1Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
19 Apr 150745.5DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ruprecht Pfalzgraf Simmer von Bayern de Rhein
Bishop Ruprecht Pfalzgraf Simmer von Bayern de Rhein (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg
Ordained BishopRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 221
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1492, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast