Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Hohenzollern

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1449¹Born
1478¹29.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
21 Mar 148637.2SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
21 Jun 148637.4ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
17 Sep 148637.7Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
8 Mar 150556.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Hohenzollern (VIAF: 25028850)
Bishop Friedrich von Hohenzollern (born 1449, died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHohenzollern
Ordained BishopChurch, Dillingen

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,407
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,486, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast