Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Zehender, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1473AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
3 Dec 1473AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
19 Dec 1473Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
15 Sep 1500DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Daniel Zehender:
Bishop Daniel Zehender O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 103
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,528

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013