Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto von Sonnenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1452¹Born
30 Sep 147422.7SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
10 Nov 148028.8ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
31 Mar 148129.2Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
21 Mar 149139.2DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto von Sonnenberg (VIAF: 902775)
Bishop Otto von Sonnenberg (born 1452, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,621
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast