Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel von Eyb

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1455Born
5 Dec 149641.1SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
2 Mar 149741.4ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
16 Apr 149741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
30 Oct 153580.0DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gabriel von Eyb (VIAF: 35304026)
Bishop Gabriel von Eyb (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArberg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,432
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 22 Mar 2019

Quantcast